judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALONZO GIBSON-BEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0853
Short Caption:ALONZO GIBSON-BEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1849-83Filed Date:08/25/1989

Opening Event Date:08/25/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:09/12/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlonzo Gibson-Bey N
Allen M. Lenchek YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sherri L. Evans YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BEY-GIBSON, ALONZO UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/12/90 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 TO CONS 89-853 W/86-304 & 88- NOTE - 02 110; REC FL IN 86-304 & 88-110 NOTE - 02 TO BE DEEMED AS A SUPP REC IN NOTE - 03 THIS CASE; BRF OF APLE REMAIN NOTE - 03 TO BE FL BY 2/26/90.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/09/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LENCHEKA FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - EVANSS FOR - APPELLEE
09/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ALLEN M. LENCHEK, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD DSA
12/14/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 102489 SCHPRD R
01/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE W/86-304 AND 88-110 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 012490 SCHPRD BA
02/12/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD Q
02/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD RECORD FILED IN NOS. 86-304 & 88-110. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 22, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 022690 SCHPRD BE
03/22/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 26, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1990RECEIVED BRIEF OF APLE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/23/1990ORDER DIRG CLK TO FILE APLE'S LODGED BR; FO CASE TO BE SCHEDULED AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1990ARGUED PANELFETEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF ORDER ON APPEAL PANELFETEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1990NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIIN SUPREME COURT #90-6097 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD Denied