judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WHITE, ROLAND J. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1343
Short Caption:WHITE, ROLAND J. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M3749-84Filed Date:09/17/1986

Opening Event Date:09/17/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/21/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/11/1987
Argued/Submitted:09/29/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Keith Winston WattersYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Elizabeth TrosmanYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WHITE, ROLAND J. UNITED STATES
09/17/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/21/1987FiledRecord Completed
05/11/1987FiledBriefing Completed
09/29/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/30/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition