judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

COY, JAMES L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1283
Short Caption:COY, JAMES L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M16215-85Filed Date:09/04/1986

Opening Event Date:09/04/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/24/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/28/1987
Argued/Submitted:03/16/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/07/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Michele D. Grayson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
W. Mark Nebeker YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COY, JAMES L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 021187 ORDER: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 01 IN 10 DAYS OTSC WHY APPOINTMNT NOTE - 02 SHLD NOT BE VACATED & THIS NOTE - 02 MATTER REF TO THE BOARD ON NOTE - 03 PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY. NOTE - 03
09/04/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/31/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHELE GRAYSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1986RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 110486 SCHPRD R
01/14/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: NO BA. EBP (VACATED ORDER 3/13/87) PANELPY SCDATE 121786 SCHPRD BA
02/11/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. (VACATED ORDER 3/13/87) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 012687 SCHPRD STATE
03/13/1987ORDER SS, VACATING 1/14/87 & 2/11/87 ORDERS; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 022387 SCHPRD ANS
04/16/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AFTER FILING OF TRANSCRIPT (NO OPPO) PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 042287 SCHPRD BA
06/22/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (222 PGS - RAMOS) PB PANEL SCDATE 080187 SCHPRD RT
06/24/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/24/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD BA
08/05/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE BR; CLK TO FILE LDGD BR; APLE BR DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. EBP PANELBE SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD OPE
09/28/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/28/87 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD BE
10/28/1987FiledBriefing Completed
10/28/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 102887 SCHPRD BE
03/16/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/16/1988SUBMITTED PANELPYBERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF CONVICTIONS ON APPEAL PANELPYBERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/07/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD