judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM T. GRAY III V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1654
Short Caption:WILLIAM T. GRAY III V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Lead: 86-CM-1649 Consolidated: 86-CM-1650 , 86-CM-1654
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M17480-85Filed Date:12/09/1986

Opening Event Date:12/09/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/03/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/19/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/05/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/10/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam Gray NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GRAY III, WILLIAM T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 3/31/87 ORD: DENYING IFP MO NOTE - 01 W/O PREJUDICE TO APLT SUBMITNG NOTE - 02 PROPERLY COMPLETED AFFIDAVIT; NOTE - 02 CNSOL 86-1649,86-1650& 86-1654 NOTE - 03 CON 86-1649 & 86-1650 NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 7/9/87 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 04 TO ATAY MANDATE; DENY PETN OF NOTE - 05 BILL OF PARTICULARS; BRF OF NOTE - 05 APLT DUE IN 4-0 DAYS/ NOTE - 06 7/27/87 ORD: VACATING THIS NOTE - 06 COURT'S 7/6/87 ORDER; CLK TO NOTE - 07 ALLOW APLT TO PROCEED ON NOTE - 07 APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS; APLT NOTE - 08 DIRECTED TO FILE A STATEMENT NOTE - 08 IN 10 DAYS INDICATING WHETHER NOTE - 09 HE DESIRES TO HAVE COUNSEL NOTE - 09 APPOINTED TO REPRESENT HIM. NOTE - 10 9/19/88 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO FOR NOTE - 10 LV TO CORRECT CAPTION OF PET. NOTE - 11 AND DENY APLT'S PET FOR REH NOTE - 11 OR REH EN BANC. JUDGE SCHWELB NOTE - 12 HAS RECUSED FROM THIS CASE. NOTE - 12 NOTE - 13 011389 ORD: DENY MO TO CLARIFY NOTE - 13 TREATED AS A MO FOR RECONSDRN NOTE - 14 DENY MO TO STRIKE & VACATE THE NOTE - 14 CRT'S 8/11/88 MOJ; DENY MO TO NOTE - 15 STAY MANDATE PENDING WRIT OF NOTE - 15 CERT.
01/01/1904JUDGE - SW AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/07/05 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GRAYW FOR - pro se ATTY 2 - PATTERSONN FOR - APPELLEE
12/09/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/19/1986APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 121986 SCHPRD DSA
02/05/1987LETTER REQUESTING APLT TO FILE FORM 5 AFF & MOTION TO APPT COUNSEL W/I 15 DAYS KK PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FILEDS 01&02. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1987FiledRecord Completed
04/03/1987RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 020987 SCHPRD R
04/08/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO MARCH 31ST COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 042087 SCHPRD CHECK
04/08/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY MANDATE PENDING PETITION FOR PER CURIAM REVIEW & AFFIRMANCE IN 86-1650 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/08/1987RECEIVED APLT'S RESPONSE PETIION TO MARCH 27TH ORDER IN 86-1650 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1987MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO PETITION FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS IN 86-1650 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1987ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS OTSC WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED - NO FEE. EBP (VACATED 7/27/87) PANELPY SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD OPE
07/09/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 AND 05 DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S 7/6/87 ORDER PB PANEL SCDATE 071687 SCHPRD ANSA
07/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (PET FOR BILL OF PARTICULAR PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO RECEIVE COPY OF TRANSCRIPTS WITHOUT PREPAY- MENT COSTS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/27/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-09 CWC PANELPY SCDATE 072487 SCHPRD CHECK
07/27/1987RECORD ON APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO JULY 27TH ORDER REGARDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL JB PANEL SCDATE 080687 SCHPRD ANSA
08/19/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/19/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 86-1649 & 86-1650 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (7 PGS - SHELTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1987ORDER REFER MO OF APLT TO RECV COPY OF RT W/OUT PAYMENT OF COSTS TO TRL CRT FOR RECONSID. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD OPE
08/28/1987ORDER APLE BR DUE 9/23 & CLK TO SCHD ON CAL AS SOON THEREAFTER AS THE BIZ OF THE CT PERMITS. EBP PANELBE SCDATE 081387 SCHPRD CHECK
09/11/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCT. 15TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 092387 SCHPRD BE
09/22/1987APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RJG PANEL SCDATE 092387 SCHPRD OPA
09/24/1987MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR SUMMARY JUDG- MENT OF ACQUITTAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 30 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXT. & TO ENTER AN EXPEDITED JUDGE- MENT OF ACQUITTAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 102687 SCHPRD OPA
10/26/1987ORDER DENY MO OF APLT FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 100287 SCHPRD CHECK
10/28/1987MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO CLARIFY REASONS FOR 10/26/87 ORDER OF DENIAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 IN 86-1649(9 PGS. -- HUNT) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (55 PGS - HART) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987ORDER DENY MO'S OF APLT TO STRIKE & CLARIFY ORDER; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 102787 SCHPRD OPA
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (96 PGS. GLEASON) EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/31/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE APPELLANT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1988ORDER DENY MO OF APLT FOR SUMM REV; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD BE
01/29/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 5TH JB PANEL SCDATE 020288 SCHPRD BE
02/03/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (287 PGS - ARTIS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OF ACQUITTAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 021088 SCHPRD OPA
02/19/1988FiledBriefing Completed
02/19/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION FROM CT RPTR SCHERTZER OF 12/6/85 RT. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1988ORDER DENY MO OF APLT FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD OPE
03/30/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (29 PGS - ARTIS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 9/16/86 & 10/20/86 RT FROM CT RP WATKINS (DUPLICATE REQUEST) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1988ORDER GRANT PRO SE REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 7/5/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD OPE
06/29/1988APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE INSERTIONS MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION MOTION OF APPELLANT TO EXTEND TIME FOR ORAL ARGUMENT. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/05/1988ARGUED PANELMKTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1988ORDER DENY MO'S OF APLT TO SUPP REC; TO STRIKW & TO EXT TM FOR ORAL ARG. DAS PANELMKTEST SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD OPE
08/10/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELMKTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/24/1988AFFIRMED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO CORRECT CAPTION OF MRRB RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10 THRU 12 SL PANELEB SCDATE 082988 SCHPRD VS
09/21/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR CLARIFICATION OF 9/19/88 ORDER DENY RIGHT TO REDRESS GOV'T RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO STRIKE & VACATE COURT'S 8/11/88 MEMO RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY MANDATE PENDING WRIT OF CERTIORARI RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE APPELLEE'S 9/12/88 REPLY & TO REOPEN RECONSIDERATION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1988RECEIVED LETTER DTD 9/30/88 FROM ADELAIDE M. MILLER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1989RECEIVED ORDER FROM SUPREME COURT 1/9/89, DENYING CERTIORARI MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 13-15 ACG PANELMKTEST SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD OPE
02/10/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD