judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HENRY L. KYLE JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0900
Short Caption:HENRY L. KYLE JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8886-88Filed Date:07/25/1989

Opening Event Date:07/25/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/22/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/31/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHenry L. Kyle, Jr.N
Daniel E. Ellenbogen NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KYLE JR., HENRY L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/12/91 ORD: GRANT MO OF CNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF BRADFORD JOHNSON & APPT NOTE - 02 DANIEL ELLENBOGEN FOR APLT; NOTE - 03 BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 03
01/01/1906 JOHNSONBRAD VACATED 6/12/91
07/25/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BRADFORD P. JOHNSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD CHECK
10/10/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
10/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(9 PGS/BREMEN) AD PANEL SCDATE 120189 SCHPRD RT
11/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(3 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(6 PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989RECORD COMPLETED
05/29/1991COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DANIEL E. ELLENBOGEN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 060691 SCHPRD GG
06/27/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/16/1991LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT; RESPONSE DUE BY 8/16/91. EVH PANELJAC SCDATE 062891 SCHPRD Q
07/26/1991LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT; RESPONSE DUE BY 8/26/91. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 081691 SCHPRD ANSA
01/10/1992ORDER DISMISSING CASE. DAS PANELFESCKN SCDATE 122091 SCHPRD VS
01/10/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
01/10/1992DISMISSED
01/31/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD