judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HUMPHREY BRANN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0947
Short Caption:HUMPHREY BRANN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14165-88Filed Date:09/14/1989

Opening Event Date:09/14/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/25/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/20/1991
Argued/Submitted:11/06/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/17/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHumphrey Brann N
W. Douglas WhamYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Albert A. Herring YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BRANN, HUMPHREY UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 90-1093 NOTE - 01
09/14/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) W. DOUGLAS WHAM, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
12/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD R
02/28/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (253 PGS. -- CALHOUN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022590 SCHPRD RT
03/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(13 PGS/JANIFER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD BA
03/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (317-PGS/CALHOUN) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990ORDER STAYING BRIEFING SCH AND DIRG COUNSEL, W/IN 30 DAYS, TO FL STMT RE STATUS OF MOT. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE RE PENDING TRIAL COURT MOTION AD PANEL SCDATE 050490 SCHPRD ANSA
07/17/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE STMT W/IN 20 DAYS RE STATUS OF MOT IN TR CT. FVH PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1990STATEMENT OF PENDING TRIAL COURT MOTION AD PANEL SCDATE 080690 SCHPRD STATE
08/28/1990RECEIVED APLT REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1990ORDER APLT TO FL DSA IN NO. 90-1093, W/IN 10 DAYS. GW PANELRO SCDATE 091190 SCHPRD V
09/19/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 90-1093. AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1991RECORD ON APPEAL IN 90-1093 PANEL SCDATE 101790 SCHPRD R
03/22/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(127 PGS/CALHOUN) AD PANEL SCDATE 030391 SCHPRD RT
03/25/1991FiledRecord Completed
04/18/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/20/1991FiledBriefing Completed
05/20/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 052091 SCHPRD BE
11/06/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/06/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGFEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/26/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGFEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/26/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/17/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD