judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAROLD E. MONROE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0945
Short Caption:HAROLD E. MONROE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F99957-76Filed Date:09/06/1989

Opening Event Date:09/06/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/25/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHarold E. Monroe NPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MONROE, HAROLD E. UNITED STATES
09/06/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/20/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD R
11/08/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989ORDER DENY MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. GW PANELRO SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD Q
06/01/1990ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO FILE DSA OR APPEAL SHALL STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
06/22/1990ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR APLT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH 6/1/90 ORDER. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
07/25/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD