judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Denton County, Texas District Court Record

Register of Actions
Case No. 21-1875-158
William Urrego and Ligia Urrego v Jessie Lee Ward a/k/a Jessie Lee O'Sullivan and Oleksandr Lozenko§
§
§
§
§
§
Case Type:Debt/Contract: Debt/Contract
Date Filed:03/12/2021
Location:158th Judicial District Court
Judicial Officer:Burgess, Steve
File Custody/Location: District Clerk's Office
Related Case Information
Related Cases
E21-053J2 (Related Civil Case)
Party Information
Lead Attorneys
DefendantLozenko, Oleksandr
DefendantWard, Jessie Lee Also Known As O'Sullivan, Jessie LeeTimothy Micah Dortch
  Retained
2911 Turtle Creek BLVD
STE 1000
Dallas, TX 75219

214-396-9427(W)
469-217-8296(F)
PlaintiffUrrego, LigiaDarrell Wayne Cook
  Retained
6688 N Central EXPY
STE 1000
Dallas, TX 75206

214-368-4686(W)
214-593-5713(F)
PlaintiffUrrego, WilliamDarrell Wayne Cook
  Retained
6688 N Central EXPY
STE 1000
Dallas, TX 75206

214-368-4686(W)
214-593-5713(F)
Events & Orders of the Court
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS
03/12/2021Plaintiff's Original Petition
03/12/2021Request for Issuance of
Citations
Made by: Urrego, Ligia
Made by: Urrego, William
03/12/2021
Citation
e-served in envelope # 51426802
Ward, Jessie Lee Unserved
Lozenko, Oleksandr Unserved
04/07/2021Waiver of Service or Citation
for Defendant Jessie Lee Ward a/k/a Jessie Lee O'Sullivan
Party: Ward, Jessie Lee
04/07/2021Cover Letter
04/27/2021Defendant's Original Answer
and Affirmative Defenses
Party: Ward, Jessie Lee
05/04/2021First Amended (Original) Petition
Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition
Party: Urrego, Ligia
Party: Urrego, William
05/04/2021Cover Letter
from Rebecca Spurgin
05/14/2021Attorney Vacation or Out of Office Letter from:
Catherine Keith
06/24/2021Request
for Trial Date - reviewed by coordinator
Party: Cook, Darrell Wayne
Financial Information
Defendant Ward, Jessie Lee
Total Financial Assessment 293.00
Total Payments and Credits 293.00
Balance Due as of 07/10/2021 0.00
03/12/2021Transaction Assessment 293.00
03/12/2021TexFile Payment Receipt # 2021-7366 Ward, Jessie Lee (293.00)


Case NumberStyleFiled/Location/Judicial OfficerType/Status
21-1875-158 William Urrego and Ligia Urrego v Jessie Lee Ward a/k/a Jessie Lee O'Sullivan and Oleksandr Lozenko
03/12/2021
158th Judicial District Court
Burgess, Steve
Debt/Contract: Debt/Contract
Active