judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IDA P. ROSS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1273
Short Caption:IDA P. ROSS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1979-89Filed Date:10/25/1989

Opening Event Date:10/25/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/15/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/07/1991
Argued/Submitted:04/29/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/23/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantIda P. Ross N
Ronald A. Goodbread YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Leslie Ann Gerardo NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROSS, IDA P. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
10/25/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RONALD A. GOODBREAD, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD DSA
12/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD R
01/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (5 PGS. -- PIRFO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 050690 SCHPRD RT
04/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(142 PGS/PAVLISH) AD PANEL SCDATE 042090 SCHPRD RT
04/25/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(7 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 041990 SCHPRD RT
06/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (241-PGS/FRANKLIN) AJ PANEL SCDATE 050590 SCHPRD RT
01/15/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (ORDER 12/10/90) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/15/1991RECORD COMPLETED
07/24/1991ORDER APLT BRF DUE W/IN 40 DYS FRM DT OF ORDER. APLE BRF DUE W/IN 30 DYS THEREAFTER. NFX. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 062891 SCHPRD U
09/03/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 3, 1991 RJG PANEL SCDATE 090391 SCHPRD BA
09/17/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT EXT TM FL BRF TO 10/3/91, BE TO BE FILED 11/7 /91. NFX. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 090591 SCHPRD K
09/23/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 100391 SCHPRD BA
11/07/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 110791 SCHPRD BE
11/07/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/29/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/29/1992ARGUED JJ SC KG MK Ronald A. Goodbread, Esq. for appellant; Leslie Ann Wise, Esq. for appellee.
06/02/1992AFFIRMED MOJ (SC KG MK)
06/02/1992AFFIRMED
06/23/1992MANDATE ISSUED