judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TRACY MCFADDEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1307
Short Caption:TRACY MCFADDEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F15311-88Filed Date:11/02/1989

Opening Event Date:11/02/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:04/01/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/24/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTracy Mcfadden N
Elaine J. Mittleman YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
David A. Payne YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCFADDEN, TRACY UNITED STATES
01/01/1902MMS
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ANTHONY GARDNER NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 10/04/90 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 02 BY 11/16/90; BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 03 BY 12/21/90; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 03 9/9/91; SCHED CASE ON NOTE - 04 MARCH 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 04
11/15/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ELAINE MITTLEMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD DSA
01/22/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 010390 SCHPRD R
04/26/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(207 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 022190 SCHPRD RT
10/04/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 04 ADVANCE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 091190 SCHPRD GR
11/16/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 111690 SCHPRD BA
12/21/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 122190 SCHPRD BE
01/14/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 010991 SCHPRD RBA
01/14/1991RECEIVED APLT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 010991 SCHPRD RBA
01/15/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLE MO FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED VERSION OF BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/15/1991RECEIVED CORRECTED COPY OF APLE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF CORRECTED BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1991ORDER GRNT APLE MO LV FL LODGD COR- RECTD BRF & GRNT APLT MO LV TO FL REPLY BRF. PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/01/1991SUBMITTED PANELSCWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELSCWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/03/1991DISMISSED
04/24/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1991MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1991RECEIVED ORDER FOR CRIMINAL DIVISION AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/27/1992ORDER Deny motion of appellant to recall mandate as untimely. Request for leave to file notice of appeal out of time is referred to the Superior Court for disposition.