judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID P. HICKSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0605
Short Caption:DAVID P. HICKSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2084-81Filed Date:05/23/1988

Opening Event Date:05/23/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/12/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/13/1991
Argued/Submitted:12/11/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid P. Hickson N
James W. KleinNY
Allen W. Levy YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Shanlon WuYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HICKSON, DAVID P. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/10/91 ORD: BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 01 BY 08/09/91; BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 02 BY 09/13/91; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 02 10/2/91; SCHED CASE ON NOTE - 03 DECEMBER 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 03
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/12/11 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LEVYA FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - WUS FOR - APPELLEE
05/23/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/01/1988STATEMENT RE: TRANSCRIPT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/02/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 061388 SCHPRD DSA
07/28/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (261 PGS RT - MILLER /18 PGS RT - MOLLICHELLI / 37 PGS RT PAVLISH) GT PANEL SCDATE 072288 SCHPRD R
08/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF PENDING RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(39 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
04/12/1990FiledRecord Completed
04/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(3 PGS/BOSTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03 FOR ADVANCE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 052991 SCHPRD U
08/08/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 080991 SCHPRD BA
09/13/1991FiledBriefing Completed
09/13/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF & APPENDIX PMB PANEL SCDATE 091391 SCHPRD BE
12/11/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/11/1991ARGUED PANELSCWGKG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSCWGKG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/08/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD