judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CURTIS L. IRICK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0134
Short Caption:CURTIS L. IRICK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead:87-CF-0134Consolidated: 87-CF-0429 , 87-CF-0592
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F382-86Filed Date:02/03/1987

Opening Event Date:02/03/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/06/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/22/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/10/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/16/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCurtis L. Irick N
Calvin Steinmetz YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Ann K. H. SimonYN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901IRICK, CURTIS L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: JERRY DANIELS NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 SEE 87-592 & 87-429 NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 111987 ORDER: GRANT APLE REQ NOTE - 03 TO CONSOLIDATE #87-134 W/CONS NOTE - 04 NOS. 87-429 & 87-592; APLTS NOTE - 04 BRS DUE IN 40 DAYS, FO:CONS BR NOTE - 05 OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 CON 87-429 & 87-592. NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 3/9/90 ORD: JUDGE FARRELL HAS NOTE - 07 RECUSED FROM THIS CASE. JUDGE NOTE - 08 NEWMAN WOULD GRANT REHEARING. NOTE - 08 CHIEF JUDGE ROGERS, & JUDGES NOTE - 09 NEWMAN AND FERREN WOULD GRANT NOTE - 09 REHEARING EN BANC.
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/11/10 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SIMONA FOR - APPELLEE TRDATE- 88/11/10 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MASONT FOR - APLT JERRY ATTY 2 - STEINMETZC FOR - APLT IRICK ATTY 3 - SLAIGHTJ FOR - APLT LARRY
02/03/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CALVIN STEINMETZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
04/03/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 040687 SCHPRD R
04/06/1987FiledRecord Completed
05/14/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD BA
08/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 SEE 87-592 (43 PGS. - KACZOROWSKI) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (20 PGS - TOOBY) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (2264 PGS - BURNS) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (124 PGS RT-HOLLAND) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/19/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062387 SCHPRD RT
12/23/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 29TH (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 122987 SCHPRD BA
12/28/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 29TH IN 87-592(NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/9/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 012988 SCHPRD BA
01/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-592 TO FEBRUARY 5TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD CHECK
02/08/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 020988 SCHPRD BA
02/08/1988ORDER GRANT MOS OF APLTS TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/9/88 DAS PANELPY SCDATE 020288 SCHPRD X
02/09/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF FOR APPELLANT JERRY DANIELS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF FOR APPELLANT LARRY DANIELS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 12, 1988 (NO OPPO FROM JERRY DANIELS ONLY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD BE
04/06/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 5/12/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 032988 SCHPRD OPA
05/11/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/26/88 (NO OPA) MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 051288 SCHPRD BE
05/27/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF ONE DAY LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 052688 SCHPRD BE
05/27/1988APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE BRF IN EXCESS OF PAGES JB PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/27/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/22/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (APPELLANT) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT FOR REPLY BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/03/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT IN 87-592 FOR LV TO FL RBA & CLK TO FL RBA. DAS PANELNWBESC SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD VS
11/08/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF IN 87-592 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/10/1988ARGUED PANELNWBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989AFFIRMED JDGMT AF JDGMT OF CONVICTION PANELNWBESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -SW CITE 565 A.2d 26
10/05/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 2254 OPINION TYPE D JUDGE - NW PAGE # - 0000
10/19/1989MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC TO 11-2-89 APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC ON OR BEFORE 11/2/89 SL PANELRO SCDATE 103189 SCHPRD OPE
11/02/1989PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 110289 SCHPRD MRRB
11/02/1989STATEMENT OF APLT TO ADOPT CO-APPELLANTS PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEAR- ING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1990ORDER APLE W/I 20 DAYS TO FILE RESPONSE TO PET FOR REH/REH EB (10 COPIES) SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO PET. FOR REH/REH EN BANC AD PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD ANSE
03/16/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD