judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BRIAN A. BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0192
Short Caption:BRIAN A. BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 85-CF-1163 Consolidated:87-CF-0192, 88-CM-1054
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2809-84Filed Date:02/25/1987

Opening Event Date:02/25/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/10/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/12/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/15/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/15/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBrian A. Brown N
Richard S. StolkerNY
AppellantBrian A. Brown N
Carl V. AngelisNY
AppellantBrian A. Brown N
Calvin Steinmetz NN
AppellantBrian A. Brown N
J. Herbie Difonzo NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Saul M. PilchenYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, BRIAN A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/1/87 ORDERED: SUA SPONTE NOTE - 01 THAT APPEAL NOS. 85-1163 & NOTE - 02 87-192 HEREBY CONS FOR ALL NOTE - 02 PURPOSES. FO MO GRT; APLT'S NOTE - 03 BR IN NO. 85-1163 DUE 4/15/87; NOTE - 03 NFX NOTE - 04 CON 85-1163 & 88-1054 NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 5/11/87 ORDERED: GRT MO CLK IS NOTE - 05 DIR TO FILE THE LDGD APLT'S BR NOTE - 06 IN NO. 85-1163; APLT'S BR IN NOTE - 06 NO. 87-192 SHALL BE FILED ON NOTE - 07 6/12/87 & THE CON APLE'S BR NOTE - 07 DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. NOTE - 08 8/18/87 ORD: GRANT MO'S OF NOTE - 08 RICHARD STOLKER FOR LV TO W/D NOTE - 09 FROM APPEALS 85-1163 & 87-192 NOTE - 09 & APPT CARL V. ANGELIS TO NOTE - 10 REPRESENT APLT'S; NEWLY APPTD NOTE - 10 COUNSEL TO FL STATE IN 10 DAYS NOTE - 11 WHETHER A SUPP BRF WILL BE FL NOTE - 11 ON BEHALF OF APLT; CONS BRF OF NOTE - 12 APLE DUE 30 DAYS AFTER A STATE NOTE - 12 OR SUPP BRF, WHICHEVER OCCURS NOTE - 13 LATER IS FL W/THIS CRT. NOTE - 13 NOTE - 14 10/14/87 ORD: APLT'S SUPPL. NOTE - 14 BRIEF SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEF NOTE - 15 10/26/87. FO THAT THE CONSOL. NOTE - 15 BRIEF OF APLE SHALL BE FILED NOTE - 16 W/I 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. NOTE - 16 NOTE - 17 4/7/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 17 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATED APPM NOTE - 18 OF CARL V. ANGELIS & APPT NOTE - 18 CALVIN STEINMETZ FOR APLT;NEW NOTE - 19 APPT COUNSEL MAY FL SUPP BRF NOTE - 19 IN 20 DAYS AND BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 20 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. NOTE - 20 NOTE - 21 7/29/88 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO FOR NOTE - 21 STAY AND ALL PROC. ARE HEREBY NOTE - 22 STAYED PDG DISP OF THE MO TO NOTE - 22 VACATE SENTENCE FILED IN THE NOTE - 23 TRIAL COURT. FO THAT CNSL FOR NOTE - 23 APLT W/I 30 DAYS SHALL ADVISE NOTE - 24 THIS COURT RE STATUS OF SAID NOTE - 24 MOTION. NOTE - 25 102188 ORDER: SS, CON 88-1054 NOTE - 25 W/ 85-1163 & 87-192; FO: CLK NOTE - 26 SUP CT TO TRANSMIT RECORD IN NOTE - 26 88-1054 F/W; FO: COUNSEL FOR NOTE - 27 APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE NOTE - 27 INDICATING WHETHER ADD RT WILL NOTE - 28 BE ORDERED FOR THESE APPEALS. NOTE - 28 NOTE - 29 11/14/89 ORD: DENY APLT'S PRO NOTE - 29 SE MO FOR TRANSMISSION OF THE NOTE - 30 RECORD TO THE U.S. SUPREME CT. NOTE - 30 W/O PREJUDICE TO ITS RENEWAL NOTE - 31 IF, AND WHEN, THE PETITION FOR NOTE - 31 WRIT OF CERTIORARI IS GRANTED. NOTE - 32 1/11/90 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 32 APPT COUNSEL AND J. HERBIE NOTE - 33 DIFONZO, ESQ., IS HEREBY APPTD NOTE - 33 AS COUNSEL TO REPRESENT APLT NOTE - 34 AND THAT NEWLY-APPTD COUNSEL NOTE - 34 IS DIRTD TO FILE AN NOTE - 35 APPROPRIATE MOTION, IF ANY, NOTE - 35 W/I 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF NOTE - 36 THIS ORDER. NOTE - 36
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/05/15 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - STEINMETZC FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - VOLKOVM FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 STOLKERR VACATED 8/18/87 ANGELISC VACATED 4/7/88. DIFONZOJ VACATED 4/11/90
02/25/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/01/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 TTC PANELPY SCDATE 032087 SCHPRD CHECK
04/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD S. STOLKER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN 85-1163 PB PANEL SCDATE 041587 SCHPRD BA
04/17/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 85-1163 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD R
04/27/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD DSA
05/11/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN NO. 85-1163 TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 7 TTC PANELPY SCDATE 042987 SCHPRD OPE
06/15/1987COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APPELLANT'S COUNSEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1987RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE; MOTION FOR APPEAL & MOTION TO SUSPEND ATTORNEYS MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CARL V. ANGELIS, ESQ. (SEE 85-1163 FOR VOUCHER) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08-13. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 061287 SCHPRD BA
08/26/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR EXT. OF TIME TO FILE COURT-ORDERED STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO AUGUST 18TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD STATE
10/14/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 14 THRU 16 SL PANELPY SCDATE 092487 SCHPRD CHECK
10/26/1987APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO TO NOV 25TH (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 102687 SCHPRD SMA
11/25/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 15, 1987 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 112587 SCHPRD SMA
12/15/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 85-1163 FOR 15 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 12/30/87; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD DAS
12/31/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 123087 SCHPRD BA
12/31/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1988RECEIVED MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, FOR SUSPENSION OR DISBARMENT OF ATTORNEY MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BA; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 010588 SCHPRD DAS
01/20/1988ORDER DENY MO OF APLT FOR SUSPENSION OF DISBARMENT OF ATTORNEY. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/15/88 (NO OPPO) PB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 021588 SCHPRD BE
02/18/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT (PRO SE) TO FILE PETITION TO REMOVE CRIMINAL PROC. FROM SUPERIOR COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/18/1988RECEIVED LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE DATED 2/13/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/18/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S (PRO SE) PETITION TO REMOVE CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS FROM SUPERIOR COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/18/1988RECEIVED LETTER & BRIEF FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 18, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 031588 SCHPRD BE
03/23/1988ORDER DENY MO OF APLT FOR REMOVAL OF CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS IN SUPER CRT. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD OPE
03/23/1988APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXT. OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 032888 SCHPRD OPA
03/28/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 4/18/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 032588 SCHPRD V
04/01/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 17-20. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD Q
04/08/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CALVIN STEINMETZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/28/1988APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO TO MAY 27TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 042788 SCHPRD SMA
05/12/1988RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APLT REQ. STAY OF ORDER PENDING APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/20/1988LETTER TO CNSL FOR APLT RE MOTION FOR STAY RCVD FROM APLT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1988APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO TO 6/27/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 052788 SCHPRD MLSMA
06/09/1988LETTER DATED 6/3/88 FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE COURT LETTER 5/20/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD CHECK
06/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (15 PGS - SHELTON) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL SUPPLE -MENTAL BRF TO 6/27/88. PB PANELPY SCDATE 061388 SCHPRD V
06/21/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (12 PGS - HART) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY TO AFTER TRIAL COURT RULES ON MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE MLH PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD SMA
07/11/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 7/2/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE, RE STATUS OF CASE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/26/1988RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: LEGAL CORRESPONDENCE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 21 THRU 24 SL PANELPY SCDATE 072288 SCHPRD N
08/12/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLENT RE STATUS OF MOTION TO VACATE SENTENCE IN TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 082988 SCHPRD CHECK
10/21/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 25 - 28. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD CHECK
10/25/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO OCTOBER 21ST ORDER REGARDING TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD STATE
11/04/1988RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APLT RE INEFFECTIVE ASSISTANCE OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1988ORDER CLK OF SUP CT TO TRANSMIT REC IN 88-1054 F/W; CONS BR OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFT. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 102588 SCHPRD M
11/10/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/10/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1988RECORD ON APPEAL IN 88-1054 AD PANEL SCDATE 120188 SCHPRD R
11/14/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 11/1/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1988FiledBriefing Completed
12/12/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD BE
12/13/1988LETTER TO CNSL FOR APLT RE LTRS RCVD FROM APLT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1989RECEIVED LETTER DATED 3/16/89 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE, REQUESTING COPIES OF ALL PLEADINGS MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/15/1989ARGUED PANELRGSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF SUPERIOR COURT JUDGMENT PANELRGSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/24/1989ORDER DENIYNG PETITION FOR REHEARING SL PANELROSTSC SCDATE 080189 SCHPRD VS
08/29/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT (PRO SE) TO STAY MANDATE PENDING APPLICATION FOR CERT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1989ORDER DENY PRO SE MO OF APLT TO STAY MANDATE. DAS PANELROSTSC SCDATE 090889 SCHPRD OPE
09/15/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR TRANSMISSION OF THE RECORD TO US SUPREME COURT FOR CERT. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1989LETTER FROM US SUPREME COURT GRANTING EXT. OF TIME TO FILE PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERT. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 29 THRU 31 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) J. HERBIE DiFONZO, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 32 THRU 36 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSEIN RE: NEWLY APPOINTED COUNSEL TO 3/14/90 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO FOR EX TO FL CONS BRF TO 3/14/90; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 030290 SCHPRD K
03/14/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO VACATE APT OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1990ORDER GRANTG MO OF J.HERBIE DIFONZO, ESQ., TO W/DRAW; VACATING HIS APPOINTMENT. CWC PANELRO SCDATE 031490 SCHPRD BA
05/13/1991RECEIVED REQUEST FORM FROM DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS FOR PLEADINGS FRM APLT'S FILE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/20/1991RECEIVED PRO SE PLEADING APPELLANT RE: MOTION TO CORRECT ILLEGAL SENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1991ORDER APLT'S NOTICE TO CORRECT ILLE- GAL SENT ETC. DENIED. MEH PANELROSTSC SCDATE 053091 SCHPRD VS