judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TONY M. MURPHY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0219
Short Caption:TONY M. MURPHY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F949-86Filed Date:03/05/1987

Opening Event Date:03/05/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/24/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/27/1988
Argued/Submitted:01/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/19/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTony M. Murphy N
Lloyd T. Shanley YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kevin A. Forder YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MURPHY, TONY M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MEREDITH LITTLE NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 1/19/89 ORD: SUA SPONTE THAT NOTE - 02 ON OR BEF 2/6/89, EACH PARTY NOTE - 03 SHALL FILE A SUPPL MEMORANDUM NOTE - 03 ADDRESSING THE FOLLOWING NOTE - 04 QUESTIONS: 1) BY WHAT NOTE - 04 AUTHORITY WAS THE TRIAL COURT NOTE - 05 ENTITLED TO ASK DEFENSE NOTE - 05 COUNSEL, BEFORE THE CLOSE OF NOTE - 06 THE GOVT'S CASE, WHAT HIS NOTE - 06 DEFENSE WOULD BE? 2) WAS NOTE - 07 DEFENSE COUNSEL REQUIRED TO NOTE - 07 ANSWER THE COURT'S QUESTIONS, NOTE - 08 OR DID HE HAVE A RIGHT ON NOTE - 08 BEHALF OF HIS CLIENT TO NOTE - 09 REFUSE? NOTE - 09
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/01/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SHANLEYL FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FORDERK FOR - APPELLEE
03/05/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LLOYD T. SHANLEY III, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD DSA
04/30/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 050487 SCHPRD R
12/24/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/24/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/24/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (367 PGS - TREMEL) JB PANEL SCDATE 121887 SCHPRD RT
02/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 03/03/88 ( NO OPPOSITION ) GT (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/15/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 030388 SCHPRD BA
03/18/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FILE BRF; CLK TO FILE BRF; APLE'S BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS PB PANELPY SCDATE 033088 SCHPRD OPE
04/11/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/23/88 MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 042188 SCHPRD BE
05/24/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/23/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD BE
06/24/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/27/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 061688 SCHPRD V
07/26/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (15 PGS - TREMEL) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/12/1989ARGUED PANELNWTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 9 SL PANELNWTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1989APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMOTO 3/8/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 020689 SCHPRD SME
02/06/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL SUPP BRF TO 3/8/89. DAS PANELNWTESC SCDATE 012689 SCHPRD VS
02/09/1989APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO TO 3-8-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 020689 SCHPRD SMA
02/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL SUPP BRF TO 3/8/89. DAS PANELNWTESC SCDATE 020989 SCHPRD VS
03/08/1989APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMOTO 3/15/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 030889 SCHPRD SME
03/14/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1989APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO AD (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989ORDER GRANT MO'S OF APLT & APLE & CLK TO FL SUPP BRF OF APLT & APLE. DAS PANELNWTESC SCDATE 030889 SCHPRD OPA
03/23/1989APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/04/1989LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS LTR OF 7/17/89 SL PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1990AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELNWTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 572 A.2d 435
03/28/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 0867 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 0000 (CC/DS IN PART)
04/19/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD