judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM MCKNIGHT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0156
Short Caption:WILLIAM MCKNIGHT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3234-86Filed Date:01/27/1987

Opening Event Date:01/27/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/14/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/21/1987
Argued/Submitted:12/01/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam Mcknight N
G. Godwin Oyewole YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Helen M. Bollwerk YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCKNIGHT, WILLIAM UNITED STATES
01/27/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/14/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/21/1987FiledBriefing Completed
12/01/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/03/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition