judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RODRIC MORRIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0102
Short Caption:RODRIC MORRIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Lead:87-CF-0102Consolidated: 87-CF-0115 , 87-CF-0197 , 87-CF-0290
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4674-85Filed Date:01/22/1987

Opening Event Date:01/22/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/19/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/30/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/14/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/22/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRodric Morris N
Edwin H. Harvey NN
AppellantRodric Morris N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Geoffrey R. Brigham YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MORRIS, RODRIC UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/29/87 ORD: SUA SPONTE THAT NOTE - 01 APPEAL NOS. 87-102, 87-115, NOTE - 02 87-197, & 87-290 ARE HEREBY NOTE - 02 CON FOR ALL PURPOSES, & FO NOTE - 03 MOS GRT ONLY TO THE EXTENT NOTE - 03 THAT THE APLT'S BR IN NOS. 87- NOTE - 04 197 & 87-290 DUE IN 30 DAYS; NOTE - 04 & THIS COURT'S 5/26/87, ORDER NOTE - 05 IN NO. 87-115 IS HEREBY NOTE - 05 VACATED & THE BR OF APLT IN NOTE - 06 NO. 87-115 DUE IN 30 DAYS; CON NOTE - 06 BR OF APLE DUE 30 DAYS NOTE - 07 THEREAFTER. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 CON 87-197 AND 87-290 NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 7/15/87 ORD: DISMISSING 87-115 NOTE - 09 AS A DUPLICATE OF 87-102; NOTE - 10 BRIEFS OF APLTS IN 87-197 AND NOTE - 10 87-290 SHALL REMAIN DUE TO BE NOTE - 11 FILED ON OR BEFORE 7/29/87. NOTE - 11 NOTE - 12 11/16/87 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO NOTE - 12 IN NO 87-290 TO FILE BRIEF ON NOTE - 13 OR BEF 11/27/87 (NFX). FO THAT NOTE - 13 THE CONSOLIDATED BRIEF OF APLE NOTE - 14 SHALL BE FILED 30 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 14 APLT'S BRIEF IN NO 87-290.
01/01/1906 BRIGHAMG DEPT OF JUSTICE
01/22/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/13/1987$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/20/1987$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1987FiledRecord Completed
03/19/1987RECORD ON APPEAL SEE 8/3/87 ORDER. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1987APPEARANCE OF RALPH WARREN & EDWIN HARVEY AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS FILE OUT OF TIME JB PANEL SCDATE 040887 SCHPRD OPE
03/27/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (1,237 PGS - BURNS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 020287 SCHPRD DR
04/22/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/19/87 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (68 PGS - HART) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1987DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND SRT TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1987ORDER GRT MOS CLK IS DIR TO FILE THE LDGD DSA & DR/SRT; APLT'S BR DUE 6/19/87. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 040887 SCHPRD OPE
05/14/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (79 PGS - HUNT) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 071687 SCHPRD BA
06/29/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 7 TTC PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 09-11 CWC PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-290 TO SEPTEMBER 28TH JB PANEL SCDATE 072987 SCHPRD BA
07/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-197 TO AUGUST 19TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 072987 SCHPRD BA
08/03/1987ORDER RECORD IN APPEAL NO. 87-115 SHALL BE DEEMED RECORD IN NO. 87-102. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1987ORDER BRFS OF APLT'S IN NO. 87-197 & 87-290 DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD CHECK
09/28/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-290 TO NOVEMBER 27TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/8/87 IN 87-197 PANEL SCDATE 091887 SCHPRD BA
10/19/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OUT OF TIME IN 87-197 (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 100887 SCHPRD CHECK
10/19/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 87-197 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987ORDER GRNT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF IN 87-197 & CLK TO FL BRF BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS.DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 12 THRU 14 SL PANELPY SCDATE 101387 SCHPRD OPE
11/30/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 17, 1988 IN 87-290 RJG PANEL SCDATE 112787 SCHPRD BA
12/14/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT IN 87-290 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/27/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 120987 SCHPRD OPE
01/27/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-290 TO MARCH 11TH JB PANEL SCDATE 012788 SCHPRD BA
02/23/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT IN 87-290 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/11/88; ANFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 020988 SCHPRD OPE
03/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 87-290 TO FILE BRIEF BY 4/9/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 031188 SCHPRD BA
04/11/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 15TH IN 87-290 JB PANEL SCDATE 032388 SCHPRD OPE
05/03/1988ORDER BRF OF APLT IN 87-290 DUE BY 5/15/88 OR COUNSEL FOR APLT REFERRED TO BPR. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF OF APPELLANT IN 87-290 RJG PANEL SCDATE 051588 SCHPRD BA
07/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/22//88 RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 061588 SCHPRD BE
08/10/1988APPEARANCE OF GEOFFREY R. BRIGHAM AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/21/88 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD BE
08/26/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 9/21/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD V
09/19/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 23RD (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 092188 SCHPRD BE
09/23/1988RECEIVED APPELLE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/30/1988FiledBriefing Completed
09/30/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(STIPULATION AND EXHIBIT VIDEO CASSETTE) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT IN 87-197 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY IN 87-197 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1989MOTION TO SUBMIT WITHOUT ARGUMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1989LETTER FRM USA RE: MISSTATEMENT MADE IN REPLY BRIEF OF HAYWOOD PHILLIPS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1989MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 3/13/89 LTR OF APLE TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 030889 SCHPRD VS
03/13/1989ORDER GRANTMO OF APLT TO SUBMIT;GRNT MO OF APLT IN 87-197 FOR LV TO FL RBA & CLK TO FL RBA. DAS PANELROMKPY SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD OPE
03/13/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF IN NO. 97-197 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/14/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGMKPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1989RECEIVED LETTER DATED 5/1/89, FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1989LETTER TO APLT'S COUNSEL RE: APLTS 5/3/89 LTR. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1989APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1989AFFIRMED JDGMT AF JDGMT OF CONVICTION PANELRGMKPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -MK CITE 564 A.2d 746
09/29/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - MK PAGE # - 2211
10/03/1989APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING IN 87-290 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD