judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VERNANDO E. BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0130
Short Caption:VERNANDO E. BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:87-CF-0130Consolidated: 87-CF-0856
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6133-86Filed Date:02/05/1987

Opening Event Date:02/05/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/03/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/13/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/16/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/31/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVernando E. Brown N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Heidi M. Pasichow YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, VERNANDO E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 1/13/88 ORD: GRANT MO TO CONS NOTE - 01 87-130 & 87-856; GRANT MO OF NOTE - 02 APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & CLK NOTE - 02 TO FL BA;BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 NOTE - 03 CON 87-856 NOTE - 03
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/11/16 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MEYERSP FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - PASICHOWH FOR - APPELLEE
02/05/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/19/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER H. MEYERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 041387 SCHPRD CHECK
04/03/1987FiledRecord Completed
04/03/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 040687 SCHPRD R
10/22/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/3/87 PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JAN. 4TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 120387 SCHPRD BA
12/22/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 87-856 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 & 02. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 122187 SCHPRD OPE
01/15/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEB 23RD (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 021588 SCHPRD BE
02/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/24/88 PB PANEL SCDATE 022388 SCHPRD BE
03/16/1988ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 3/24/88 - NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 030788 SCHPRD OPA
03/24/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 24, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 032488 SCHPRD BE
04/04/1988APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 040588 SCHPRD OPA
04/27/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TWO DAYS LATE MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 041488 SCHPRD CHECK
04/27/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (10 PGS - TREMEL) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1988FiledBriefing Completed
05/13/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 11/16/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD OPE
11/16/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/16/1988ARGUED PANELRGSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 554 A.2d 1157
03/09/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 0381
03/31/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD