judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL PETTAWAY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0525
Short Caption:MICHAEL PETTAWAY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead:88-CF-0525Consolidated: 88-CF-0576
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7297-87Filed Date:05/11/1988

Opening Event Date:05/11/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/09/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/03/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael Pettaway N
Elaine J. Mittleman YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PETTAWAY, MICHAEL UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 3/30/89 ORD: GRANT MO OT CONS NOTE - 01 88-525 & 88-576; FLNG OF APLES NOTE - 02 BRF IN 88-525 SHALL BE STAYED NOTE - 02 PENDG FURTHER ORDER OF CRT. NOTE - 03 CON 88-576 NOTE - 03
05/11/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/27/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ELAINE MITTLEMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 060688 SCHPRD DSA
07/08/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 061388 SCHPRD R
09/09/1988FiledRecord Completed
09/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (397 PGS - FINNERIN) JB PANEL SCDATE 091288 SCHPRD RT
09/13/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 5TH JB PANEL SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD BA
11/14/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 12/5/88. PB PANELPY SCDATE 110888 SCHPRD V
12/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD BA
12/19/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 24, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT & CLK TO FL BA; GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/24/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD X
02/15/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 88-576 AND TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 88-525 JB PANEL SCDATE 022489 SCHPRD BE
03/30/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 & 02. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD Q
11/08/1989ORDER JUDGMENT ON APPEAL AFFIRMED IN 88-576, APLT'S BRF IN 88-525 DUE IN 40 DAYS. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 100189 SCHPRD CHECK
11/20/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: FILING OF BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 121289 SCHPRD BA
11/28/1989ORDER VACATE 11/8/89 ORDER TO EXTENT APLE'S BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD M
12/06/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO REMAND RJG PANEL SCDATE 122889 SCHPRD BE
12/13/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/13/1989ORDER GRANTING APLE'S MOTION TO REMAND APPEAL TO TRIAL COURT. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
01/03/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD