judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDRE BYRD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0551
Short Caption:ANDRE BYRD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10304-86Filed Date:05/09/1988

Opening Event Date:05/09/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/16/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/27/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/25/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndre Byrd N
Calvin Steinmetz NN
AppellantAndre Byrd N
M. Elizabeth Kent YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BYRD, ANDRE AKA ANDRE MCNAIR UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 8/17/89 ORD: GRT MO FOR LV TO NOTE - 01 WITHDRAW AND THE APPTMT OF NOTE - 02 CALVIN STEINMETZ, ESQ., AS NOTE - 02 CNSL FOR APLT IS HEREBY NOTE - 03 VACATED. FO THAT M. ELIZABETH NOTE - 03 KENT, ESQ., IS HEREBY APPTD AS NOTE - 04 CNSL TO REPRESENT APLT ON THIS NOTE - 04 APPEAL. NOTE - 05 10/31/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 05 POSTPONE CASE AND APLT SHALL NOTE - 06 FILE A SUPPL BRF ON OR BEFORE NOTE - 06 11/30/89 AND APLE SHALL NOTE - 07 RESPOND W/I 10 DAS THEREAFTER. NOTE - 07 FO THAT THIS MATTER IS RESCHD NOTE - 08 FOR THE SUMM CALENDAR OF NOTE - 08 TUES. DEC. 12, 1989 AT 1:30 PM
01/01/1906 STEINMETZC VACATED PER 8/17/89 ORDER
05/09/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/20/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CALVIN STEINMETZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/27/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 053188 SCHPRD DSA
07/07/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 070888 SCHPRD R
07/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 082288 SCHPRD BA
08/22/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 12/18/87 RT FROM CT RPTR TANNER. EBP PANEL SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD RT
08/31/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF 40 DAYS AFTR RT IS FILED. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 083188 SCHPRD OPE
09/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(356 PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AD PANEL SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD RT
11/16/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/16/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(144 PGS/TANNER) AD PANEL SCDATE 112088 SCHPRD RT
12/27/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-16-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD BA
01/17/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/03/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/03/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF, CLK TO FL LDG BRF, APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 012489 SCHPRD V
03/02/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 30, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 030689 SCHPRD BE
03/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/30/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD CHECK
03/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 27, 1989. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 4/27/89-NFX. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 041089 SCHPRD CHECK
04/27/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/27/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 042789 SCHPRD BE
07/13/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) M. ELIZABETH KENT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO POSTPONE/CONTINUE ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 8 SL PANELBESTPY SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD VS
11/30/1989APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM RJG PANEL SCDATE 113089 SCHPRD SMA
12/06/1989RECEIVED AMENDMENT TO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1989APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM JB PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD SME
12/12/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/12/1989SUBMITTED PANELBESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL (CASE RM FOR RESENTENCING per MOJ) PANELBESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/25/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1991LETTER FROM PRO SE APPELLANT REQ. RECALL OF THE MANDATE(?) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1991LETTER REFER 3/5/91 LTR FROM APLT TO COUNSEL FOR ADVICE. MEH PANELJC SCDATE 031591 SCHPRD CHECK
04/12/1991LETTER FROM COUNSEL RESPONDING TO 4/5/91 LTR FROM JAC. MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1991ORDER APLT'S PRO SE MOT FOR EXT TO FILE MOT TO RECALL MANDATE IS DENIED. MEH PANELBESTPY SCDATE 042091 SCHPRD CHECK