judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEROSCOE L. WRIGHT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0556
Short Caption:DEROSCOE L. WRIGHT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7578-87Filed Date:05/03/1988

Opening Event Date:05/03/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/17/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/05/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDeroscoe L. Wright N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Helen M. Bollwerk YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WRIGHT, DEROSCOE L. UNITED STATES
05/03/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/03/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER H. MEYERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 061388 SCHPRD DSA
06/28/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 070588 SCHPRD R
06/29/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/26/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL TRANSCRIPT IS DOCKETED GT PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
08/17/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 40 DAYS AFT RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 081288 SCHPRD M
08/22/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (16 PGS RT - SCHOCH) GT PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD RT
01/17/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/17/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(13 PGS/RAMOS) AD PANEL SCDATE 123088 SCHPRD RT
03/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 30TH JB PANEL SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD BA
03/14/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 3/30/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD OPE
03/28/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD BA
04/27/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 31, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 042889 SCHPRD BE
05/03/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO MAY 31, 1989. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 050289 SCHPRD M
05/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-6-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 053189 SCHPRD BE
06/05/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/3/89; NFX. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 060989 SCHPRD CHECK
07/03/1989APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD UNDER SEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/05/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD BE
07/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO SUPP & PLACE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 070789 SCHPRD Q
07/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL FILED BY GOVT. MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/12/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/08/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990LETTER FROM JUDGE RICHTER W/ATTACH- MENTS RECEIVED FROM APPELLANT PRO SE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1990RECEIVED OF CORESPONDENCE FOR ROSCOE WRIGHT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD