judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KENNY ODIWE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0505
Short Caption:KENNY ODIWE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10132-87Filed Date:05/04/1988

Opening Event Date:05/04/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/23/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/06/1989
Argued/Submitted:03/29/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/28/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKenny Odiwe N
James W. KleinNY
John M. Mott YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
David M. Zlotnick YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ODIWE, KENNY AKA ROBE SOLER UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/24/90 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 01 STAY ISSUANCE OF MANDATE AND NOTE - 02 TO EXT TIME TO FILE PET AND NOTE - 02 PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC SHALL NOTE - 03 BE FILED W/I 21 DAYS FROM DATE NOTE - 03 OF THIS ORDER.
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
05/04/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/09/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 051988 SCHPRD DSA
05/25/1988STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 070588 SCHPRD R
08/10/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (18 PGS - TANNER) JB PANEL SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD RT
08/11/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (98 PGS RT - HART) GT PANEL SCDATE 082488 SCHPRD RT
02/27/1989COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (118 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
06/23/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/23/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(295 PGS/WATKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 012089 SCHPRD RT
08/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 1ST (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 080289 SCHPRD BA
08/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/1/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081489 SCHPRD CHECK
09/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-01-89 AD (NO OPPO) PANEL SCDATE 090189 SCHPRD BA
09/11/1989ORDER GRT APLT MOTION FOR EXT OF TIME TO FILE BRF TO 10/1/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD V
10/02/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 100189 SCHPRD BA
11/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-6-89 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD BE
11/13/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLE'S BR TO AND INC. 12/6/89. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989FiledBriefing Completed
12/06/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 120689 SCHPRD BE
01/05/1990LETTER RE CASE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/29/1990SUBMITTED PANELTESTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELTESTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY ISSUANCE OF THE MANDATE & EXT. OF TIME TO FILE PETITION FOR REHEARING RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 SL PANELRO SCDATE 043090 SCHPRD OPE
05/18/1990MOTION FOR LV TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING EN BANC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 051590 SCHPRD MRRB
05/24/1990RECEIVED SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1990ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE PET AND CLK IS DIRTD TO FILE LODGED PET FOR REH EN BANC SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD