judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9873
A-9873
11/29/1963
Application for Writ of Error
JOYCE BELL BURKITT, INDEPENDENT EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE W. BURKITT, DECEASED, C. O. RYAN
D. J. GLENNEY, III
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/20/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/17/1964Response to Brief filedRespondent
01/14/1964Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
12/13/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
11/29/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/20/1964Affidavit filed
02/20/1964Affidavit filed
02/20/1964Motion for RehearingFiling granted
01/17/1964Response to Brief filed
01/14/1964Brief on the Merits
12/13/1963Response to Petition
11/29/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/29/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
D. J. Glenney, IIIRespondent
Rola HammClerk of the Court of Appeals
C. O. RyanPetitioner
Joyce Bell Burkitt, Independent Executrix of the Estate of George W. Burkitt, deceasedPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information