judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9860
A-9860
11/18/1963
Application for Writ of Error
R. WRIGHT ARMSTRONG, JR.
SALVATORE E. MANZO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/02/1964Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/10/1964Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/29/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/09/1963Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
12/09/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
11/18/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/02/1964Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/12/1964Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
02/10/1964Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/29/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/09/1963Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
12/09/1963Response to Petition
12/02/1963Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
12/02/1963Motion for leave to file brief
11/18/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/18/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R. Wright Armstrong, Jr.Petitioner
Salvatore E. ManzoRespondent
Sproesser WynnAmicus Curiae
Preston A. Weatherred, et al.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information