judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CIRCUS CIRCUS ENTERPRISES VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36943
Short Caption:CIRCUS CIRCUS ENTERPRISES VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39212
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A391840Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Senior Justice YoungPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/27/2001How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/03/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
11/03/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lionel Sawyer & Collins--check no. 114878.
11/03/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-19310
11/03/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Volumes 1 through 3. 00-19311
11/03/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Expedite Consideration of Petitioners' Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, to Vacate Trial Scheduled for January 9, 2001. 00-19312
11/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption on this court's docket so that it is consistent with the caption on this order.] Answer due from the real party in interest on behalf of respondents: 30 days from the date of this order. Fn2[We defer ruling on petitioners' motion for expedited consideration of the writ petition or, in the alternative, to vacate the scheduled trial date. We note that petitioners apparently have not sought a stay of proceedings in the district court.] 00-20444
12/14/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Petitioners enclosing copy of "Order Granting Defendan'ts Motion to Stay Proceedings pending the Nevada Supreme Court's Review of Defendants' Petition for Writ of Mandamus" filed in district court on December 11, 2000. 00-21889
12/22/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Respondent and Real Party in Interest, Manuel Carrillo. 00-22312
12/22/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Plaintiff's Supplemental Appendix to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Vols. I through VI. 00-22313
01/29/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motion to Expedite or to Vacate Trial Date. Because petitioners have provided this court with a copy of a district court order staying the underlying proceedings pending our review of the writ petition, we deny the motion as moot. 01-01917
03/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral Argument will not be scheduled and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. SNP01A-WM/ML/NB 01-05390
03/27/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP01A-WM/ML/NB
06/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. " . . . we hereby deny the petition." SNP01A-WM/ML/NB 01-09664
07/09/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-10299
07/09/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.