judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GAGE VS. DALEY

Case Information: 39090
Short Caption:GAGE VS. DALEYCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40638
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A431778Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/31/2002 / Segerblom, RichardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/17/2002Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Beckley Singleton--check no. 088947.
01/17/2002Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 02-01198
01/30/2002Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Richard Segerblom. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/04/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 02-02247
02/05/2002Notice/Outgoing Letter. Richard Segerblom. (Docketing statement)
02/13/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Supplement to Docketing Statement. 02-02848
02/15/2002Notice/Outgoing Letter. Richard Segerblom. (Supplement to Docketing Statement)
06/26/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-11021
07/02/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-11360
07/16/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due: 30 days. The preparation of transcripts and the briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. 02-12209
07/18/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 02-12343
08/19/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 02-14115
08/27/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. In response to our order to show cause, appellants concede that they were not parties to the underlying action and that this appeal must be dismissed. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-14720
09/24/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-15119
09/24/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/30/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 26, 2002. 02-15119