judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9930
A-9930
12/30/1963
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
SHOPPER WORLD, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/10/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/24/1964Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/16/1964Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/27/1964Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/22/1964Response to PetitionRespondent
12/30/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/09/1964Letter Filed
06/10/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/27/1964Opinion issued
05/27/1964Concurring Opinion issued.
03/24/1964Supplemental Brief filed
03/16/1964Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/27/1964Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/22/1964Response to Petition
12/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
12/30/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Shopper World, Inc.Respondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Waggoner Carr, Attorney General of Texas and Norman V. Suarez, Assistant Attorney GeneralAmicus Curiae
Jay S. FichtnerAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information