Case: 96-1281
96-1281
12/18/1996
App Writ of Error
JAMES WILSON
WESTERN ATLAS INTERNATIONAL INC. d/b/a ATLAS WIRELINE SERVICES and WESTERN GEOPHYSICAL COMPANY OF AMERICA ATLAS WIRELINE SERVICE DIVISION OF WESTERN ATLAS INTERNATIONAL INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
01/17/1997 | Reply to Response | Respondent | on behalf of Western Atlas | |
12/18/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/12/1997 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | case stored | | |
03/13/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | Application for writ of error is denied, with the notation, "Writ Denied". | |
01/22/1997 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
01/17/1997 | Reply to Response | on behalf of Western Atlas | | |
01/06/1997 | MET to file reply disposed of | Filing granted | Motion to extend time to file reply to app writ err is granted to and including 17 January, 1997. | |
01/03/1997 | Call received | from Atty Pete Rutter (works with Atty Charles Clark) to inform the Court that he is filing a m/e/t to file Reply with agreement from Pet's council | | |
12/18/1996 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/12/1997 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 1G3 record returned |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
WILSON, JAMES | Petitioner | Mr. Gregory A. Fraser Mr. Richard O. McKennon Mr. Ronald D. Wren |
WESTERN ATLAS INTERNATIONAL | Respondent | Mr. Charles H. Clark |
DIVISION OF WESTERN ATLAS INT. | Respondent | Mr. Charles H. Clark |
ATLAS WIRELINE SERVICES | Respondent | Mr. Charles H. Clark |
WESTERN GEOPHYSICAL COMP. OF A | Respondent | Mr. Charles H. Clark |
Court of Appeals Information:
12-94-00340-CV
Rev'd & Remd'd
930 SW2d 782, 08-27-96
12th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
114th District Court
Smith
Honorable Cynthia S. Kent
90-2485-B