Case: C-9874
C-9874
05/23/1990
App Writ of Error
GUY DUVALL AND CAROL ANN SMITH
ROBERT A. YAGOS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/04/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
06/08/1990 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
05/23/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/04/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
07/23/1990 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | NO REHEARING FILED | | |
06/20/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
06/14/1990 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
06/14/1990 | No description available. | | | |
06/08/1990 | Reply to Response | | | |
05/23/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
07/23/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-89-00577-CV
Reversed & Remanded
RULE 90, 03-07-90
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable PAT MCCLUNG
Trial Court Information
193rd District Court
Dallas
88-11199-L