judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-94-00080-CR
08-94-00080-CR
04/05/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Valtierra, Manuel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/13/1995Mandate Issued
10/13/1995Shuck purged
10/13/1995Mandate Issued
07/27/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/27/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/31/1995Submitted
05/31/1995Submission
05/31/1995Submitted
04/04/1995Submission
02/22/1995Brief Filed
02/22/1995Case ready to be set
02/22/1995Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/22/1995Case ready to be set
02/07/1995Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/01/1995Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/17/1995Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/07/1994Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1994Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/12/1994Brief Filed
10/12/1994Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/12/1994Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/1994Miscellaneous Motion Filed
09/26/1994Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
07/27/1994Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/13/1994Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
06/23/1994Statement of Facts Filed
06/23/1994Transcript Filed
04/05/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/05/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/13/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasHon. Jaime E. Esparza
VALTIERRA, MANUELCriminal - AppellantHon. John Gates
Trial Court Information
120th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Robert Dinsmoor
69793
Life+$2,500 fine each ct.