judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00318-CR
14-94-00318-CR
04/04/1994
Other Drug Possession
Pratt, Robert Anthony
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/25/1997Case stored
04/17/1997Mandate due to be issued
04/17/1997Mandate Issued
04/17/1997Mandate Issued
04/02/1997Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
12/02/1996Petition for discretionary review due
12/02/1996Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/15/1996Motion for rehearing DUE
11/15/1996No motion for rehearing FILED
10/31/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/31/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/25/1996Submitted
06/25/1996Submission
06/25/1996Submitted
04/24/1996Submission
03/21/1995Case ready to be set
03/21/1995Case ready to be set
02/23/1995State's brief DUE
02/21/1995Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/26/1995Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/26/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/23/1995Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
01/23/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/16/1995Appellant's brief DUE
12/29/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/20/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/14/1994Past due brief
11/28/1994Appellant's brief DUE
11/03/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/28/1994Appellant's brief DUE
10/28/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/28/1994Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
09/15/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
09/01/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
08/04/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
07/28/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
07/28/1994Record due
07/26/1994Transcript FILED
04/05/1994Motion for new trial FILED
04/04/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/30/1994Date of Sentence
03/30/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2023Case StoredCase archived
04/17/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantTom Moran
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
682357
50 yrs. TDC