judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8497
A-8497
06/29/1961
Application for Writ of Error
MISSOURI PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
ORIN T. WATSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/18/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/28/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/14/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
06/29/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/24/1961Response to Motion filed
10/18/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/28/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/14/1961Response to Petition
06/29/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Missouri Pacific Railroad CompanyPetitioner
Charles J. Lieck, Sr.Amicus Curiae
Orin T. WatsonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information