judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8485
A-8485
06/26/1961
Application for Writ of Error
EMIL KNUTSON
SHELDON RIPSON, C. W. NORTON AND DON HOUSE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/05/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/01/1962Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/29/1961Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
11/24/1961Post submission brief filedRespondent
07/12/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
07/10/1961Response to PetitionPetitioner
06/26/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/26/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/05/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/01/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/17/1962Opinion issued
11/29/1961Supplemental Brief filed
11/24/1961Post submission brief filed
10/25/1961Document received (See Remarks)
07/12/1961Response to Petition
07/10/1961Response to Petition
06/26/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/26/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/26/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Emil KnutsonPetitioner
Sheldon Ripson, C. W. Norton and Don HouseRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information