judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5512
B-5512
09/09/1975
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN L. WALL
EAST TEXAS TEACHERS CREDIT UNION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/25/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/02/1976Post submission brief filedRespondent
09/09/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
09/09/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/25/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/11/1976Opinion issued
01/02/1976Post submission brief filed
11/05/1975Document received (See Remarks)
11/05/1975Document received (See Remarks)
09/09/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/09/1975Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/09/1975Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
East Texas Teachers Credit UnionRespondent
John L. WallPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information