judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00171-CR
03-94-00171-CR
04/01/1994
DWI
Angus Gilchrist Shaw
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/14/1997CASE STORED
09/15/1995Mandate Issued
07/19/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/16/1995Appellant's brief overdue notice in criminal case
04/05/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/31/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/20/1995Second notice on overdue statement of facts
02/08/1995Statement of facts overdue
10/12/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/08/1994Affidavit received
05/04/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/02/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/15/1994Statement of facts overdue
04/13/1994Letter received
04/11/1994Affidavit received
04/05/1994Statement of facts overdue
04/01/1994Transcript Filed
04/01/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/15/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. Robert Klaeger
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
Shaw, Angus GilchristAppellantMr. Angus Gilbert Shaw
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law
Burnet
M7096
$1500/730 days (PROBATED)