judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00083-CV
02-94-00083-CV
04/01/1994
Miscellaneous civil
In The Matter of N.L. (Lopez)
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/31/1995Mandate Issued
12/14/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/02/1994Submitted
11/02/1994Submission
10/31/1994Letter
08/31/1994Brief Filed
08/31/1994Case ready to be set
06/17/1994Brief Filed
05/09/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/09/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
04/11/1994Submission
04/08/1994Motion for Extension to file Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/08/1994No Description Available.
04/07/1994Motion for Extension to File Transcript Filed
04/01/1994No Description Available.
04/01/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/17/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lopez, NoeAppellantMike Berger
Unknown UserAppelleeCharles M. Mallin
Trial Court Information
323rd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Scott D. Moore
323-51299-J (93)