judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0357-94
PD-0357-94
04/04/1994
PDR Case Type
REASONER, RICKY LYNN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/18/1994FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
08/17/1994REHEAR DISPDENIED
08/17/1994REHEAR DISPDENIED
06/30/1994REHEAR FILED PDR
06/30/1994REHEAR FILED
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
05/09/1994NO RESPONSE FILED
04/04/1994PDR FILED
04/04/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/29/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateBarry L Macha
REASONER, RICKY LYNNApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Gina Brock
Court of Appeals Information:
02-93-00286-CR
DISM 2-23-94
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
30th District Court
Wichita
Honorable ROBERT P. BROTHERTON
30,105-A