judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00180-CV
02-89-00180-CV
08/18/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Smith, Richard C.
North Shore Water Supply
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/25/1992Mandate Issued
02/05/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/11/1990Submitted
04/11/1990Submission
04/05/1990Order Entered
02/13/1990Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyMotion or Writ Granted
02/12/1990Brief Filed
02/12/1990Case ready to be set
01/31/1990Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
01/18/1990Brief Filed
01/18/1990Submission
12/13/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/16/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/16/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/19/1989No Description Available.
10/18/1989No Description Available.
09/27/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1989Motion Filed
08/25/1989No Description Available.
08/25/1989No Description Available.
08/21/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/18/1989No Description Available.
08/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/25/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
North Shore Water SupplyAppellee
Smith, Richard C.Appellant
Trial Court Information
158th District Court
Denton
Honorable Ira Sam Houston
88-34-B