judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00310-CR
13-89-00310-CR
08/18/1989
Revocation of Probation
Richards, Paul
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/31/1989Mandate Issued
10/17/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
10/09/1989Due date for record to be filed
10/02/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
09/14/1989Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
08/25/1989Green card in
08/23/198910 day letter sent
08/22/1989Certified Copy Filed
08/18/1989Transcript Filed
08/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/11/1989Letter sent
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/31/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
2nd 25th District Court
Lavaca
Honorable Gus J Strauss
7511
10 yrs