judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-96-00376-CR
11-96-00376-CR
11/15/1996
Assault & battery
Lacy, Carlton Dewayne
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
11/15/1996
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/31/1997Yearly opinion book
07/23/1997Mandate issued
05/22/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/15/1997Submitted
05/15/1997Submission set in Eastland
05/08/1997Submission set in Eastland
04/14/1997TR filed
11/15/1996Case ready to be set
11/15/1996Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
11/15/1996Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasBill Hill
Lacy, Carlton DewayneCriminal - AppellantCelia M. Sams
Trial Court Information
282nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable Tom Price
F94-44263-TS
20 years