judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-96-00107-CR
06-96-00107-CR
11/15/1996
Other Drug Possession
Stevens, Demery
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/27/1997Mandate Issued
08/13/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/12/1997Submitted
08/12/1997Submission
07/29/1997Mot. to ext. time to file reply brief - grantedMotion or Writ Granted
07/18/1997Mot. ext. time to file Reply Brief
07/09/1997Case ready to be set
07/09/1997Waiver of Oral Argument
06/24/1997Mot. to ext. time to file reply brief - grantedMotion or Writ Granted
06/20/1997Mot. ext. time to file Reply Brief
06/17/1997Submission
06/17/1997MOTION WITHDRAW APPEAL DISPDismissed
06/17/1997MOTION WITHDRAW APPEAL DISPMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/1997MOTION FILED
05/27/1997Motion to Withdraw Attorney
05/21/1997Case ready to be set
05/21/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/16/1997Brief Filed
05/16/1997Holding for Record
05/14/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/03/1997Brief Filed
04/03/1997Request for Oral Argument
04/02/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/26/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/04/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/25/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/29/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/22/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/30/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/23/1996Statement of Facts Filed
12/23/1996Holding for Record
12/23/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/20/1996Transcript Filed
11/15/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/27/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Demery StevensAppellantHon. Paul D. Hoover
Hon. Kirk Johnson
Trial Court Information
202nd District Court
Bowie
Honorable Bill Peek
D-202-CR-90-63
8 yrs TDCJ