judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00886-CV
14-89-00886-CV
09/25/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Mohamed, Et Al, Makram
Exxon Corporation Et Al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/28/1991Case stored
05/01/1991Mandate Issued
05/01/1991Mandate Issued
04/16/1991Writ of Error DISPOSEDDENIED
09/18/1990Writ of Error FILED
09/04/1990Writ of Error FILED
08/17/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
08/02/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STADENIED
08/02/1990Opinion issuedOTHERWISE DISPOSED
08/02/1990Opinion issuedOTHERWISE DISPOSED
07/27/1990Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
07/19/1990Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehear.DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
07/19/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
06/27/1990Motion for rehearing RECEIVED - ANT,APE,PRO SE
06/22/1990Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,APP
06/07/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/07/1990Submitted
03/07/1990Submission
03/07/1990Submitted
02/08/1990Submission
12/15/1989Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
11/30/1989Amended brief FILED - ANT,APE,APP,STA,
11/30/1989Mtn.Lv.file amend.brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/20/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/20/1989Case ready to be set
11/20/1989Case ready to be set
11/17/1989Amended brief RECEIVED - ANT,APE,APP,STA
11/17/1989Mtn.Lv.FILE amended brief - ANT,APE,APP
10/25/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/12/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
10/12/1989No description available.
10/03/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
09/28/1989Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
09/25/1989Transcript FILED
09/25/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/26/1989Motion for new trial FILED
05/27/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Carol Nelkin
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleePaul L Mitchell
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. Ingrid J. Blackwelder
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. Reagan Burch
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantJoan Lucci Bain
Trial Court Information
55th District Court
Harris
84-56184