judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00875-CR
14-89-00875-CR
09/21/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Mason, Terry Lee
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/04/1990Case stored
11/12/1990Mandate Issued
11/12/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/12/1990Mandate Issued
10/26/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
10/11/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/11/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
09/19/1990Submitted
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submitted
08/21/1990Submission
05/25/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/25/1990Case ready to be set
05/25/1990Case ready to be set
05/17/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/11/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/19/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/12/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/16/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/22/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/14/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/15/1990Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
11/24/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/14/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
11/14/1989Transcript FILED
09/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/18/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
09/15/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/04/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasCarol M. Cameron
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantJames M. Leitner
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationPRO SE
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
Honorable DONALD HUMBLE
529,381
Jury