judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00395-CV
13-89-00395-CV
09/22/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Western Geophysical Company
Priesmeyer, Clarence
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/02/1991Mandate Issued
03/27/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
02/20/1991Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
11/19/1990Application of Writ of Error sent to Supreme Court
11/06/1990Writ Filed
11/06/1990Writ of Error Fee Paid
10/04/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/19/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
09/19/1990Motion for rehearing filed
08/31/1990Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
02/01/1990Submitted
02/01/1990Submission
01/17/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/16/1990Due date for record to be filed
01/12/1990Brief Filed
01/12/1990Oral argument requested
01/11/1990Submission
12/29/1989Letter sent
12/21/1989Motion to Supplement DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/1989Filing Fee Paid
12/18/1989Oral argument requested
12/18/1989Brief Filed
12/18/1989Case ready to be set
12/15/1989Miscellaneous Motion
11/22/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/22/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
11/22/1989Exhibits Filed
09/27/1989Filing Fee Paid
09/22/1989Transcript Filed
09/22/1989Transcript Received
09/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/02/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
329th District Court
Wharton
Honorable Daniel R Sklar
28,174-S