judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00228-CR
12-89-00228-CR
09/15/1989
All Misdemeanors
Arterberry, Ray Don
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/30/1991Letter from the Court
07/15/1991Letter from the Court
05/24/1991Letter from the Court
03/18/1991Letter from the Court
12/21/1990
12/17/1990Mandate Issued
11/30/1990
11/15/1990
10/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/17/1990Submitted
10/17/1990Submission
01/25/1990
01/12/1990Brief Filed
01/12/1990Case ready to be set
01/11/1990Brief Filed
01/05/1990Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Granted
01/05/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
12/28/1989No Description Available.
12/21/1989Brief Filed
11/30/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/30/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
11/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/26/1989
10/17/1989No Description Available.
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/01/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/31/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/30/1991Case StoredCase stored
12/17/2015RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasMs. Amy R. Blalock
Arterberry, Ray DonCriminal - AppellantMr. Kathleen H. Fields
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Smith
Honorable Randall Lee Rogers
79,899-A
120 days jail/$100 fine