judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00928-CV
01-89-00928-CV
09/15/1989
Contract
White, John M. d/b/a/ Alba Corporation
Independence Bank, N.A.
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/15/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/15/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
03/01/1991Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
01/23/1991Writ disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
11/07/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
11/06/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
10/15/1990Writ filed
09/19/1990Date final opinion release for publication
09/13/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
08/17/1990Motion for rehearing filed
08/02/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/02/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/15/1990Submitted
05/15/1990Submission
05/15/1990Submitted
04/23/1990Order entered
03/28/1990Submission
03/28/1990Submission
02/14/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
02/14/1990Case ready to be set
02/14/1990Case ready to be set
01/11/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/28/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/20/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
12/07/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/22/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/22/1989Supplemental transcript filed
11/10/1989Depositons filed
10/19/1989Motion strans disposedGrant motion
10/19/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/19/1989Motion to file depositions disposedGrant motion
10/06/1989Motion for leave to file strans
10/06/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/06/1989Motion to file depositions
09/29/1989Filing fee paid
09/15/1989Transcript filed
09/15/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/18/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/15/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantHon. Gene E. Putnam
StateAppelleeJay H. Dushkin
StateAppellantEdward E. Lindsay
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
87-25243