judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1271-89
PD-1271-89
09/18/1989
PDR Case Type
LICOURT, JORGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/20/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/18/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Licourt, JorgeApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Blake Withrow
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00214-CR
Aff 7-10-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
291st District Court
Dallas
Honorable GERRY MEIER
F87-85735-PU