judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8780
A-8780
05/19/1961
Application for Writ of Error
PANSY M. GRANT
W. C. GRANT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/04/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/05/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/05/1962Amended PetitionPetitioner
01/10/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
01/05/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/04/1962Reply to Response
04/30/1962Response to Motion filed
04/10/1962Motion for emergency stay filed
04/09/1962Response to Motion filed
04/05/1962Motion for Rehearing
02/05/1962Amended Petition
01/10/1962Response to Petition
01/05/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/05/1962Document received (See Remarks)
05/24/1961Supplement to Motion filed
05/19/1961Miscellaneous Motion
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pansy M. GrantPetitioner
W. C. GrantRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information