judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01136-CR
05-89-01136-CR
09/20/1989
Other Drug Possession
Choate, Carl
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/25/2019Order enteredDestroy
06/04/2002Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
04/03/1991Mandate Issued
04/03/1991Mandate Issued
01/22/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/22/1991Submission
01/22/1991Submitted
01/22/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/22/1991Submission
01/22/1991Submitted
11/19/1990MattConv
10/01/1990Brief Filed
10/01/1990Case ready to be set
10/01/1990Case ready to be set
09/11/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/04/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/10/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/09/1990Brief Filed
08/09/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/24/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/20/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/05/1990Transcript Filed
06/11/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/06/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/07/1990Order EnteredReinstate Appeal
05/07/1990Case reinstated
04/13/1990Statement of Facts Filed
03/20/1990Response to Motion
03/15/1990Motion to Abate DisposedAbated
03/15/1990Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/15/1990Motion to Abate DisposedAbated
02/28/1990Motion to Abate Filed
02/16/1990Motion for Leave to File
02/08/1990Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/06/1990Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
01/05/1990Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/05/1990Order Withdrawn
01/04/1990Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp
01/02/1990Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
12/22/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/19/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/25/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/25/2019Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
195th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joe Kendall
F89-68826-N
20 yrs TDC