judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9078
C-9078
09/21/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
NORTH ALAMO WATER SUPPLY CORPORATION ET AL.
HONORABLE JOE B. DIBRELL JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/13/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondentBEHALF OF TX DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH
10/13/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusIntervenorBEHALF OF INT-BROWNING-FERRIS INC.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/01/1989Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED
11/08/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
10/23/1989Relator's reply brief
10/13/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusBEHALF OF TX DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH
10/13/1989Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusBEHALF OF INT-BROWNING-FERRIS INC.
10/03/1989Letter FiledBEHALF OF REAL PARTY, BROWNING FER- RIS, STATING THAT A REPLY WILL BE FORTHCOMING.
10/02/1989Letter FiledBEHALF OF REAL PARTY (TX. DEPT. OF HEALTH) - REPLY TO BE FILED BY 10/13/89. (ATTY -- CELINA ROMERO, ASST. A.G.)
09/21/1989Exhibits receivedONLY 1 ORIGINAL ATTACHED TO ORIGINAL MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS
09/21/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
09/21/1989No description available.
09/21/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/01/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BROWNING-FERRIS, INC.IntervenorMr. J. B. Ruhl
JIMMIE E. STEIDINGERRelatorMr. R. Glenn Jarvis
WILLIAM S. REVELLERelatorMr. R. Glenn Jarvis
FRANKLIN MCCLELLANRelatorMr. R. Glenn Jarvis
JAMES BROWNRelatorMr. R. Glenn Jarvis
DR. ROGER BORENRelatorMr. R. Glenn Jarvis
TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF HEALTHRespondentMs. Celina Romero
DEDRICK TERVEENRelatorMr. R. Glenn Jarvis
Court of Appeals Information:
Overruled
___ SW2d ___, 09-13-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
353rd District Court
Travis
Honorable C.G. Dibrell
454,715