judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00878-CR
14-89-00878-CR
09/21/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Glover, Kevin Garth
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/28/2001Misc motion DISPOSEDDENIED
06/21/2001Misc Motion filed
05/30/1991Mandate Issued
05/30/1991Mandate Issued
05/29/1991Case stored
05/15/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
04/17/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
01/14/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
01/07/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
12/21/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
12/06/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
12/06/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/14/1990Submitted
11/14/1990Submission
11/14/1990Submitted
11/13/1990Mtn.Addit.Attorney DISPOSED - ANT,APEGRANTED
11/13/1990Mtn.Additional Attorney FILED - ANT, APE
10/15/1990Submission
10/05/1990Supplement brief FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,REL,RES,STA
09/11/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/11/1990Case ready to be set
09/11/1990Case ready to be set
09/06/1990No description available.
08/23/1990Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
08/23/1990Order Entered
08/14/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/14/1990Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
07/19/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/16/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/21/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/15/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/24/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/16/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/19/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/13/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/14/1990Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
03/08/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
02/28/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
02/28/1990Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
02/20/1990Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
01/25/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
01/16/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
01/15/1990Transcript FILED
10/18/1989Motion for new trial FILED
09/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/18/1989Date of Sentence
09/18/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/29/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantLinda G. Moore
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantJim Skelton
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasHon. Rowena M. Young
Trial Court Information
180th District Court
Harris
Honorable PATRICIA RAE LYKOS
519,639
50 years TDC/$10,000 fine